+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On October 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.363
On October 11, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.2066
- Substituted For S6317
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On June 14, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On June 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.251
- Rules Report Cal.251
- Reported
On June 7, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On May 18, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Environmental Conservation
+ − Vote
June 20, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63