+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to education
On March 20, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On March 12, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Amended on third reading 7873a
On January 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading cal.388
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to assembly
- Died in senate
On June 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to rules
On June 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On June 17, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading rules cal.391
- Rules report cal.391
- Reported
On June 12, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to rules
On June 6, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to education
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor