+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On August 13, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.130
On August 3, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Substituted For S4837
On June 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Environmental Conservation
On June 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On June 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.184
- Rules Report Cal.184
- Reported
On June 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On May 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Environmental Conservation
+ − Vote
June 11, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor