+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On June 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Substituted By S5669a
On June 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.580
- Rules Report Cal.580
- Reported
On June 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On June 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 7832a
- Amend And Recommit To Education
On May 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Education
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor