+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.58
On May 4, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.259
On May 2, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On April 25, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On January 9, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Economic Development