+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Investigations And Government Operations
On March 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On March 10, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.475
On March 8, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On January 27, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 7808a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Governmental Operations
On January 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Operations
On May 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Operations
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor