+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On July 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.64
- Delivered To Governor
On June 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Substituted For S5647
On June 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Insurance
On June 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On June 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.178
- Rules Report Cal.178
- Reported
On June 3, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On May 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Insurance
+ − Vote
June 17, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor