+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.679
On May 17, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On April 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On April 5, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 7780a
- Amend And Recommit To Corporations, Authorities And Commissions
On January 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Committed To Corporations, Authorities And Commissions
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Died In Senate
- Returned To Assembly
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.314
On June 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Corporations, Authorities And Commissions
On June 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On June 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.177
- Rules Report Cal.177
- Reported
On June 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On May 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Corporations, Authorities And Commissions