+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On January 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Committed To Corporations, Authorities And Commissions
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.312
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Died In Senate
On June 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On June 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On June 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.419
- Rules Report Cal.419
- Reported
On June 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On June 5, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 7774b
- Amend And Recommit To Corporations, Authorities And Commissions
On June 4, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 7774a
- Amend And Recommit To Corporations, Authorities And Commissions
On May 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Corporations, Authorities And Commissions
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor