+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On June 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Substituted By S5630a
On June 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.480
- Rules Report Cal.480
- Reported
- Reported Referred To Rules
On June 3, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 7766a
- Amend And Recommit To Ways And Means
On June 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On May 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Mental Health
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor