+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 22, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.717
On March 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On January 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Committed To Governmental Employees
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.548
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Died In Senate
On June 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On June 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On May 25, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.570
On May 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On May 12, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Employees
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor