+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On June 19, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Substituted By S6451
On June 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.514
- Rules Report Cal.514
- Reported
On June 17, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On June 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Reference Changed To Codes
On June 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 7756a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Economic Development
On May 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Economic Development
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor