+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On July 25, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.121
On July 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.1150
- Substituted For S5671a
On June 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On June 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On June 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.406
- Rules Report Cal.406
- Reported
On June 7, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Amend And Recommit To Rules 7747a
On June 6, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On May 11, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Health
+ − Vote
June 21, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor