+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On August 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.202
On August 9, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.1902
- Substituted For S5936a
On June 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On June 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.348
- Rules Report Cal.348
- Reported
On June 6, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On May 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On May 11, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Higher Education
+ − Vote
June 19, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1