+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On August 30, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.221
On August 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.1269
- Substituted For S6348
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On June 6, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On May 30, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.569
On May 29, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On May 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Environmental Conservation
+ − Vote
June 11, 2019: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1