+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On September 21, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.173
On September 16, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.708
- Substituted For S7538
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Cities
On February 11, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Died In Senate
- Returned To Assembly
On January 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.284
On June 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On June 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.691
- Rules Report Cal.691
- Reported
On June 14, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On May 14, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Cities
+ − Vote
June 9, 2020: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor