+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On July 24, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.96
On July 12, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On June 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On June 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Substituted For S4276b
- 3rd Reading Cal.1010
- Passed Senate
- Returned To Assembly
On June 12, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.164
- Rules Report Cal.164
- Reported
On June 7, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
- Reported Referred To Codes
On June 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 7646a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Judiciary
On May 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Judiciary
+ − Vote
June 13, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor