+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On June 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Substituted By S5054
On June 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.298
- Rules Report Cal.298
- Reported
On June 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On June 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On May 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Children And Families
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor