+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Energy And Telecommunications
On March 26, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.540
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Died In Senate
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On June 14, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On June 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.241
- Rules Report Cal.241
- Reported
On June 7, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On May 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 7637a
- Amend And Recommit To Corporations, Authorities And Commissions
On May 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Corporations, Authorities And Commissions
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor