+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On June 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Substituted By S5685b
On June 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.406
- Rules Report Cal.406
- Reported
On June 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Amend And Recommit To Rules 7636b
On June 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On June 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 7636a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Codes
On May 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On May 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Judiciary
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor