+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On December 18, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Tabled
- Vetoed memo.268
On December 6, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to governor
On June 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to assembly
- Passed senate
- 3rd reading cal.1565
- Substituted for s5670a
On June 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Passed assembly
- Delivered to senate
On June 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to rules
On June 18, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading rules cal.471
- Rules report cal.471
- Reported
On June 17, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to rules
On June 13, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to ways and means
On June 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Print number 7630a
- Amend and recommit to governmental employees
On May 29, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to governmental employees
+ − Vote
+ − Sponsors (7)
Type:
Primary Sponsor