+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to children and families
On March 4, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On January 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading cal.372
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to assembly
- Died in senate
On June 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to rules
On June 18, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On June 17, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading rules cal.368
- Rules report cal.368
- Reported
On June 12, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to rules
On June 4, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to codes
On May 28, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to judiciary
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor