+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On July 16, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.262
On July 12, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.1426
- Substituted For S7064
On May 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Environmental Conservation
On May 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.150
- Rules Report Cal.150
- Reported
On May 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On May 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Environmental Conservation
+ − Vote
June 2, 2021: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor