+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Codes
On February 16, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On January 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.257
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Died In Senate
On June 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On June 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.488
- Rules Report Cal.488
- Reported
On May 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On May 18, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor