+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On November 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Approval Memo.16
- Signed Chap.480
On November 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.1023
- Substituted For S5991
On June 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On June 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On May 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.456
On May 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On May 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Veterans' Affairs
+ − Vote
June 5, 2019: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor