+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On December 21, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.569
On December 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Substituted For S4856
- Referred To Rules
On June 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On June 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.287
- Rules Report Cal.287
- Reported
On June 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On June 3, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On May 19, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Operations
+ − Vote
June 15, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1