+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On August 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.197
On August 9, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.2125
- Substituted For S5333
On June 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On June 7, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On May 25, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.559
On May 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On May 3, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Corporations, Authorities And Commissions
+ − Vote
June 21, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor