+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On July 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.208
On June 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.1365
- Substituted For S7038
On May 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Environmental Conservation
On May 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.148
- Rules Report Cal.148
- Reported
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On May 14, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Environmental Conservation
+ − Vote
June 1, 2021: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor