+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On December 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.534
On November 30, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Substituted For S5273
On June 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On June 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On June 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.475
- Rules Report Cal.475
- Reported
- Reported Referred To Rules
On May 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On May 19, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Local Governments
+ − Vote
June 25, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor