+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Veterans, Homeland Security And Military Affairs
On February 11, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On January 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.279
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Died In Senate
On June 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On June 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On May 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.453
On May 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On May 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Veterans' Affairs