+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On June 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Substituted by s5552b
- Rules report cal.544
- Reported
- Reported referred to rules
On May 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to ways and means
On May 22, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Print number 7572a
- Amend (t) and recommit to agriculture
On January 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to agriculture
On May 23, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to agriculture
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor