+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On June 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Substituted By S5863a
On June 19, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.602
- Rules Report Cal.602
- Reported
On June 14, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On June 5, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On May 30, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 7559a
- Amend And Recommit To Education
On May 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Education
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor