+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On October 23, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Signed chap.452
On October 11, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to governor
On June 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to assembly
- Passed senate
- 3rd reading cal.1501
- Substituted for s5617
On June 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to rules
On June 17, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On June 12, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading rules cal.269
- Rules report cal.269
- Reported
On June 4, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to rules
On May 23, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to governmental operations
+ − Vote
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor