+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On June 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Substituted By S5061a
On June 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.568
- Rules Report Cal.568
- Reported
On June 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On June 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On June 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 7553a
- Amend And Recommit To Local Governments
On May 19, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Local Governments
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor