+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On June 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Substituted By S5712a
On June 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.566
- Rules Report Cal.566
- Reported
On June 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On June 12, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 7532a
- Amend And Recommit To Ways And Means
On June 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On June 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On May 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Health
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor