+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On July 25, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.119
On July 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.906
- Substituted For S5718
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Health
On May 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On May 11, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.362
On May 9, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On May 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Health
+ − Vote
June 8, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 2