+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On November 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.456
On November 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Substituted For S5352
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Investigations And Government Operations
On June 3, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On May 29, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.512
On May 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On May 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
+ − Vote
June 15, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor