+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On June 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Signed Chap.240
On June 23, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On May 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- 3rd Reading Cal.1476
- Substituted For S9334
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Racing, Gaming And Wagering
On February 16, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Died In Senate
- Returned To Assembly
On January 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.249
On June 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On June 2, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On June 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.257
- Rules Report Cal.257
- Reported
On May 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On May 12, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Racing And Wagering
+ − Vote
May 24, 2022: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor