+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On November 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Tabled
- Vetoed Memo.240
On November 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Substituted For S4925
On June 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Labor
On June 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On June 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.153
- Rules Report Cal.153
- Reported
On June 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On May 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On May 13, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Labor
+ − Vote
June 16, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor