+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On June 8, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Substituted By S2946b
- Rules Report Cal.666
- Reported
On June 7, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On May 23, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On May 16, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 75b
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Economic Development
On April 20, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 75a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Economic Development
On January 4, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Economic Development
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor