+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On June 19, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Substituted By S3010
On June 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.282
- Rules Report Cal.282
- Reported
On June 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On June 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On May 13, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Employees