+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading cal.45
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to assembly
- Died in senate
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to judiciary
On March 13, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Delivered to senate
- Passed assembly
On March 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Advanced to third reading cal.56
On February 27, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On February 4, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to codes
On January 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to housing