+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On June 17, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Substituted By S5637a
On June 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.172
- Rules Report Cal.172
- Reported
On June 5, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On June 4, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On May 29, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 7489a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Mental Health
On May 7, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Mental Health
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor