+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On October 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Tabled
- Vetoed Memo.210
On October 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Substituted For S5391
- Referred To Rules
On June 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On June 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.281
- Rules Report Cal.281
- Reported
On June 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On June 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On May 13, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Employees
+ − Vote
June 17, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor