+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Codes
On March 28, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.288
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Died In Senate
On June 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
On June 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On June 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.393
- Rules Report Cal.393
- Reported
On June 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On May 12, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor