+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On June 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Substituted By S1706a
- Rules Report Cal.392
- Reported
On June 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Rules
On May 10, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 7451a
- Amend And Recommit To Ways And Means
On February 24, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Children And Families
On May 12, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Children And Families
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor