+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.518
On May 18, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.467
On May 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On May 9, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Codes
On April 25, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Judiciary
+ − Sponsors (31)
Type:
Primary Sponsor