+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On June 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Substituted By S5381a
On June 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.620
- Rules Report Cal.620
- Reported
- Reported Referred To Rules
On June 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On June 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 7433a
- Amend And Recommit To Local Governments
On May 12, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Local Governments
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor