+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On May 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Crime Victims, Crime And Correction
On May 23, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Delivered To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On May 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Advanced To Third Reading Cal.676
On May 17, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported
On March 22, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Correction
On June 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported Referred To Ways And Means
On May 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Print Number 7407a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Correction
On May 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Correction
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor