+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On June 21, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Substituted by s5283a
- Substituted by s5283a
On June 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading rules cal.643
- Ordered to third reading rules cal.643
- Rules report cal.643
- Reported
- Reported referred to rules
On June 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Print number 7403a
- Amend and recommit to ways and means
On May 21, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported referred to ways and means
On May 15, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to higher education
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor